Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bender, Hans, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Agyerman, Isaac S, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Does 1 - 20, Inclusive, represented by Herzog, Kelli A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Chou, Danny Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChou, Danny Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint
Date: August 04, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOE 20220204 | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | RFD.Bender 02-01-22 | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | POS re RFD.Bender 02-01-22 | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - no CMC statement. | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS ETC.. Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS ETC.. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.