Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Elm Roofing Contractors, Inc., Watson, Daniel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pedersen, Adam L, against Atias, Harel, Does 1-50, Elm Roofing Contractors, Inc., Farhi, Nissim Niss, Gafi Builders And Design, Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 7) See All represented by Florentin, Michael H, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSwope, V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Complaint
Date: April 27, 202161793Reque00f592
Date: August 10, 2022Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | 61793Reque00f592 | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance Until 9/5/22 -90 day ext as mediation is set for 6/27/22. Courtesy ext as case was on OSC list. |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - Referred to ADR Stip already filed | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 02, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, Department 23 2:00 DANIEL WATSON VS. HAREL ATIAS, ET AL. DANIEL WATSON ADAM L. PEDERSEN HAREL ATIAS MICHAEL H. FLORENTIN DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT BY CROSS-DEFENDA...
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE |
|
December 26, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, Department 23 2:00 DANIEL WATSON VS. HAREL ATIAS, ET AL. DANIEL WATSON ADAM L. PEDERSEN HAREL ATIAS MICHAEL H. FLORENTIN DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT BY CROSS-DEFENDA...
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.