Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Elite Anywhere, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fromberg, Jeffrey E, against Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, The Real Real, An Entity, Form Unknown, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
22_02_02_Ntc_of_Settlement
Date: February 02, 202222_02_04_Req_for_Dismissal
Date: February 04, 2022Complaint
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 22_02_04_Req_for_Dismissal | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 22_02_02_Ntc_of_Settlement | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.