Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
R & W Concrete Contractors, Incorporated, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bilir, Timur, against Does 1 Through 50, T.B. Penick & Sons, Inc. A California Corporation, The Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation, represented by Golia, David, Guenther, Craig E., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by R & W Concrete Contractors, Incorporated against T.B. Penick & Sons, Inc., The Western Surety Company, and fictitiously named parties. R & W Concrete Contractors alleges that it entered into a subcontract with T.B. Penick &...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 23, 2021Complaint
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - no CMC statement. | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER OF DEFENDANT T.B. PENICK & SONS INC Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER OF DEFENDANT T.B. PENICK & SONS INC |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNME Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.