Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Birnbaum, Eileen, Birnbaum, Joel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Price, Harry I, against Canvin, Jean M, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Nancy Radcliffe, As Trustee Of The Canvin Family Trust Dated June 12, 2009, Radcliffe, Nancy, represented by Peterson, P. Kurt, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Joel Birnbaum and Eileen Birnbaum against Nancy Radcliffe, Jean M. Canvin (as trustee of the Canvin Family Trust), and other unknown defendants. The complaint alleges a breach of contract and seeks specific performance.
A...
Complaint
Date: April 21, 202155997CaseM00ccb2
Date: April 09, 2022CMC 042522
Date: April 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal 112922 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 63429ANSWE00c1c1 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer to the COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) Answer to the COMPLAINT |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance Until 11/11/22 - courtesy ext as med is set for 11/1/22. |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY KARL J.F. RUNFT ON 7/1/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE Stipulation and Order to ADR COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY KARL J.F. RUNFT ON 7/1/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.