Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wald, Mary Lou, Wald, Steven Horace, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lovasz, Christopher M., against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, General Motors Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Putnam Chevrolet Cadillac, Llc, represented by Van Dao, Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V. Raymond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSwope, V. Raymond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges multiple causes of action against General Motors LLC, Putnam Chevrolet Cadillac LLC, and 20 unknown defendants. The plaintiffs, Steven Horace Wald and Mary Lou Wald, purchased a new 2017 Chevrolet Bolt from the seller, Putnam C...
Complaint
Date: April 21, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.