Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oguntala, Adekemi O, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Pj Assignment) case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Davis, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavis, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Pj Assignment) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a petition for a change of name filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The petitioner, Adekemi O. Oguntala, is requesting a change of name for herself and her daughter, Simone Jumoke Kerner. The proposed nam...
Petition for Name Change
Date: April 20, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name
Date: June 07, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 06/18/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Signed By: JUDGE DAVISDate Signed: 6/7/2021New Name: SIMONE OLAJUMOKE KERNER Decree Changing Name Signed By: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 6/7/2021 New Name: SIMONE OLAJUMOKE KERNER OGUNTALA |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 06/07/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE served on DAVID JESSE KERNER Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE served on DAVID JESSE KERNER |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Publication re: Name Change | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Change of Name Signed by Judge Davis 3, on 4/21/2021 Order to Show Cause Change of Name Signed by Judge Davis 3, on 4/21/2021 |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Name Hearing | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Name Change | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Decree Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.