Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Husain, Syed, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against Broadmoor Police Protection District, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, represented by Jacobson, Holly J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 20, 2021Opposition to Demurrer to AP 1.21.2022
Date: January 21, 2022Oppositiion to MTS 1.21.2022
Date: January 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After settlement Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash DEPOSITION NOTICE AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal 9.12.2022 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 9.12.2022 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Time estimate- 1 day Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - OSC Re: Dismissal Hearing as to Dismissal of Entire Action Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal on 10/17/22 at 9:00 am |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference RE: Trial Schedule Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement 8.12.2022 | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement 8.12.2022 Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing RE: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Related Deadlines Affidavit of Mailing RE: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Related Deadlines |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.