Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Xxxxxxxx, Xxxxxx J ., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Nishiyama, Michael B., against Does 1 To 10, Draeger'S Super Markets, represented by Depostes, Eric D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Chou, Danny Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChou, Danny Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, xxxxxx J. xxxxxxxx, is suing the defendant, Draeger's Super Markets, along with Does 1 to 10. The jurisdiction of the case is in the Superior Court of Calif...
Complaint
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 19, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 17, 2021CMS
Date: January 27, 2022ADR-Stip
Date: March 16, 202258996Notic00a8fd
Date: June 14, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: August 03, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 19, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: November 30, 2021CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: November 17, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: June 14, 2022ADR Referral
Date: February 16, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: March 21, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 27, 2022SF34002844
Date: July 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SF34002844 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 58996Notic00a8fd | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance Until 08/15/22 -courtesy 90 day ext as case was on OSC list. |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR-Stip | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation Follow Up 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.