Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
On Deck Capital, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Does 1 To 10 Inclusive, Sinclair, Jean, Woofgang'S Doggie Daycare, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 16, 2021COM39796 pos
Date: February 08, 2022COM39796 cms
Date: February 08, 2022Jean Sinclair DWOP
Date: April 28, 2022Complaint
Date: April 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Jean Sinclair DWOP | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COM39796 pos | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COM39796 cms | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer. | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.