Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Banc Of America Leasing & Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Whiteford, Kevin P., against All Size Supply Company Llc, Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreenberg, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Reyna, Renee C. |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court TEXT Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court TEXT |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT; ETC |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT; AND NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF AMENDED REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice to STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF AMENDED REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT Notice to STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF AMENDED REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice AMENDED NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF AMENDED REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERA Notice AMENDED NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF AMENDED REMOVAL OF THIS ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Due Diligence ATTEMPTED TO SERVE ALL SIZE SUPPLY COMPANY LLC C/O BRADLEY M. CLARK REG Declaration of Due Diligence ATTEMPTED TO SERVE ALL SIZE SUPPLY COMPANY LLC C/O BRADLEY M. CLARK REGISTERED AGENT |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.