Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morawietz, Victoria Anne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shapiro, Jacob, against Davis, Maureen Lynn, Does One Through Fifty, Inclusive, represented by Hitchcock, Kara L, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Victoria Anne Morawietz against defendants Maureen Lynn Davis and Does One through Fifty. The complaint alleges negligence and personal injury. The true names and capacities of the defendants are unknown, s...
Complaint
Date: April 14, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 27, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | 57758Reque00b17c | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 57170Notic003da0 | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference on 01/10/22 at 9:00 am Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference on 01/10/22 at 9:00 am |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement of Non-Agreement FIRST Statement of Non-Agreement FIRST |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered (unscanned) Document: ADR Evaluation Reason: Return To Sender, not deliverable as addressed |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO Dept 34, STIP/ORDER TO ADR Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.