Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bluepearl Operations, Llc, Lafayette Veterinary Hospital Inc., Nor Cal Veterinary Surgical Center Inc., Northern California Veterinary Surgical Inc., San Francisco Veterinary Medical Group, Inc., (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Carter, James P, against Does 1 - 100, Inclusive, Lafayette Veterinary Hospital Inc., Nor Cal Veterinary Surgical Center Inc., Northern California Veterinary Surgical Inc., San Francisco Veterinary Medical Group, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Ferrari, Giovanna A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Edward G. Weil presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward G. Weil Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
Category(07) Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 26, 2021Answer
Date: April 09, 2021Order
Date: March 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | rfd | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 62412Reque003fcd | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 60927Joint00dae4 | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Of ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CIVIL PACKET Amended Notice Of ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CIVIL PACKET |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Notice OF ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer TO COMPLAINT Answer TO COMPLAINT |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF APPEARANCE OF NEW COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF BLUEPEARL OPERATIONS, LLC Notice OF APPEARANCE OF NEW COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF BLUEPEARL OPERATIONS, LLC |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.