Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Corder, Sherrie L., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perry, Charles R., against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Heir Cash Now, Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Visher, Chandler, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: July 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Corder SIGNED 230402 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement TO FILE 230321 | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Settlement SIGNED 230316 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Nonagreement SIGNED 221228 | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment.1 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Cover TO FILE 221116 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Denying Motion 220707 | |
November 13, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE NANCY L. FINEMAN, Department 04 SHERRIE L. CORDER VS. HEIR CASH NOW, LLC, ET AL. SHERRIE L. CORDER CHARLES R. PERRY HEIR CASH NOW, LLC CHANDLER VISHER MOTION BY DEFENDANT HEIR CASH NO...
Judge: HONORABLE NANCY L. FINEMAN |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Final MSA reply2 cv | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Objs To Evid 221023 TO SUBMIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.