Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sierra, July, Syage, George, Unger, Andrea, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Sunderraj, Vikranth A, against Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Nadine, A Naughton, Nadine A. Naughton Trust, A California Trust, Naughton, Nadine A, Shriver, Jack, (total of 5) See All represented by Rosario, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
Category(33) Unlimited Wrongful Eviction |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Complaint
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 01, 2021CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: July 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-02-03 - [S] Request for Dismissal - Sierra v. Naughton Trust | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Referral | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - Referral to ADR | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of CHANGE OF HANDLING TTORNEYS WITHIN FIRM Notice of CHANGE OF HANDLING TTORNEYS WITHIN FIRM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.