Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Marat, Rolan, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Liao, Allister R., against Does 1 -10, Inclusive, Shabad, Inc. D B A Foster City Preschool And Daycare Center, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Complaint
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 01, 2021Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 12/7/2021 at 10:00 AM Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 12/7/2021 at 10:00 AM |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action Signed By: JUDGE FINEMANDate Signed: 09/16/2021 Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action Signed By: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 09/16/2021 |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM Petition for EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.