Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guzman, Raymundo, Jr, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Snyder, Jennifer R, against Does 1 - 10, Gabriel Guzman And As Trustee Of The Raymundo Guzman Revocable Trust, represented by Hourihan, John D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Raymundo Guzman Jr. against his brother, Gabriel Guzman, for damages resulting from Gabriel's physical and financial abuse of their father, Raymundo Guzman Sr. The complaint alleges that Gabriel took control of his father's...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 22, 202151947CaseM000e20
Date: January 13, 202256177CaseM00cab1
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 83034CaseM009228 | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management and Trial Setting Statement | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 80569NOTIC0080b0 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Complete ADR Process
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 10/03/2023 at 9 a.m. Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 10/03/2023 at 9 a.m. |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 77937State002262 | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement of Non-Agreement FIRST Statement of Non-Agreement FIRST |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC - Failure to Complete ADR Process - File Copy CMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.