Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lopez, Carmen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Crespo, Rafael, Jr, against Does 1 To 20, Taqueria Leon, represented by Tomlins, Craig A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Carmen Lopez against Taqueria Leon. The case number is 21-CIV-01504. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civil case...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 19, 2021Complaint
Date: March 19, 202120220315162748806
Date: March 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Complete ADR Process
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Lopez Carmen_Request for Dismissal | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 01/04/2023 Informal Discovery Conference Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video & Attorney Dane Willis for Defendant |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | OSC Needs to be set Failure to Comply with ADR | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Failure to Timely Complete ADR Process 10 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.