Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gill, Sherbir Singh, Kaur, Navneet, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zazzi, Kimberli C., against Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Fca Us Llc, Montalbano, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Sherbir Singh Gill and Navneet Kaur against FCA US LLC, Montalbano, Inc. dba Stewart Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, and 20 unknown defendants. The plaintiffs allege violations of the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act and the Bus...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 17, 2021Gill- Signed NOS
Date: January 31, 2022RFD - Gill
Date: March 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RFD - Gill | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Gill- Signed NOS | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- SERVED CT CORP. Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- SERVED CT CORP. JESSIE GASTELUM- INTAKE SPECIALIST |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.