Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in San Luis Obispo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Luis Obispo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING Background. On March 3, 2020, Plaintiffs Jeremy Rhoades and Shawna Rhoades filed a lawsuit against Defendant General Motors, LLC alleging causes of action for (1) breach of implied wa...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
February 05, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING This matter has been continued to April 6, 2021, in P2 at 9:00 a.m. O:\Operations\LKING\Judges\HURST\Tentatives\2021\Feb 2021\020921\Rhoades v. General Motors, 20CVP-0090
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
January 27, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING This matter has been continued to March 30, 2021, in P2 at 9:00 a.m. O:\Operations\LKING\Judges\HURST\Tentatives\2021\Feb 2021\020921\Rhoades v. General Motors, 20CVP-0090
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.