Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Colby, Travis, against Carey, Courtney June, represented by Sok, Curtis B, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCabe, Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: May 10, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: October 20, 2020Arraignment: Complaint
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant - Video Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint Judge: Moranda, David |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CR Criminal Courtesy Notice Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.