Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Colhoun Lindsey, Vukelich Robert A Dba Rave Construction, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tenner James, against Calhoun Lindsey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Bernie C. LaForteza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBernie C. LaForteza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2020Complaint
Date: September 10, 2020Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/21/2021)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 19, 2021Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference))
Date: August 06, 2021Brief (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 10, 2021Brief (Defendant's MSC Brief)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.