Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andrade Krista, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Manning Kimberly, against 20253 Keswick Homeowners Association A Mutual Benefit Nonprofit California Corporation, Advanced Roofing Services Inc. A California Corporation, American Contractors Indemnity Company A California Corporation, Cogency Global Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Gregory G. Smith Insurance Agency, (total of 8) See All represented by Roseman Steven A, Windham Timothy R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Huey P. Cotton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey P. Cotton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Relating and Consolidating Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal - Not Entered; Filed by: Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Opposition PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; Filed by: Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: September 16, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 02, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 16, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: November 12, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 01, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 11, 2020Answer
Date: December 11, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: December 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES)
Date: March 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: September 13, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: September 16, 2021Request for Dismissal Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Not Entered) Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: October 14, 2021Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER) Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order re Relating and Consolidating Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: September 16, 2021Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Krista Andrade (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Relating and Consolidating Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.