Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pnc Equipment Finance Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brown Michael, Brown Michael Winston, against Gomez Gilbert Aka Gilberto Gomez, Gomez Landscape & Tree Service Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Melkonian Geoffrey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Bernie C. LaForteza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBernie C. LaForteza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Order re: Plaintiff's Applications for Writs of Possession; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2020Complaint
Date: August 17, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 11, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER WITHERELL CRASTRZ RE EX PARTE NOTICE OF WOP
Date: September 14, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)
Date: September 14, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)
Date: September 14, 2020Declaration for Ex Parte Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)
Date: September 14, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM...)
Date: September 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 09/18/2020
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 18, 2020Order - ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 21, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO APPLICATIONS FOR WRITS OF POSSESSION
Date: September 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS
Date: September 25, 2020Order - ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATIONS FOR WRITS OF POSSESSION
Date: September 30, 2020Answer
Date: October 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION - CLAIM AND DEL...)
Date: September 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JUNE 23, 2021)
Date: June 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 23, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order (re: Plaintiff's Applications for Writs of Possession)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Reply to Oppositions)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (of Ex Parte Hearing on Plaintiff's Applications for Writs of Possession and Turn Over Orders)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Reply (to Oppositions to Applications for Writs of Possession)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession (Claim...))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (or Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery))
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 09/18/2020)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Born in Support of Plaitniff's Applications for Writs of Possession)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer Witherell Crastrz Re Ex Parte Notice of WOP)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Repossession Agent in Support of Plaintiff's Applications for WOP)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession - Claim and Del...))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Re-Assignment)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery))
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration for Ex Parte Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Order (Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.