Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tomich George Anthony Iii, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hutchens Lawrence, against Bert'S Mega Mall, Brp Us Inc., represented by Lancken Nicholas Von Der, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShirley K. Watkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Answer; Filed by: BRP US, INC. (Defendant); As to: George Anthony III Tomich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Anthony III Tomich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: George Anthony III Tomich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Brief Mandatory Settlemnt Brief; Filed by: George Anthony III Tomich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BRP US, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: BRP US, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BERT'S MEGA MALL (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.