Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mobile Modular Portable Storage, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Felahi Tina Safi, against B&D Racing, Schapiro Brian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheresa M. Traber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Sue Huppenthal; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Default entered as to B&D Racing; On the Complaint filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage on
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Tina Felahi; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Default entered as to B&D Racing; On the Complaint filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage on
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Default entered as to B&D Racing; On the Complaint filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage on
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Default entered as to B&D Racing; On the Complaint filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage on
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 09, 2020Complaint
Date: June 09, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 09, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 09, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: June 30, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 01, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 08, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: August 25, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 02, 2020Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: December 02, 2020Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: December 03, 2020Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUE HUPPENTHAL
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TINA FELAHI
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: April 02, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 07, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TINA FELAHI ISO DEFAULT
Date: April 07, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: April 08, 2021Default Judgment
Date: November 18, 2022Complaint Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 10, only) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Tina Felahi) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sue Huppenthal) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice (notice of entry of jugment) Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve California...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mobile Modular Portable Storage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Support of Writ of Possession)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Claim and Delivery)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sue Huppenthal ISO Default Prove Up)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/28/2020)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jared Bissell ISO Default Prove Up)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve California...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order to Serve California Secretary of State on Behalf of Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 10, only)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); ...))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Claim and Delivery)
Date: December 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/28/2020
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 07, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUE HUPPENTHAL ISO DEFAULT PROVE UP
Date: February 05, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 28, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 05, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JARED BISSELL ISO DEFAULT PROVE UP
Date: February 05, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10, ONLY
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (CCP 484.040); ...)
Date: February 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUGMENT
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: March 22, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: March 26, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE
Date: March 26, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.