Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Angelina & Katherine Garden Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kooshki Kam, against Sinaeifar Sogol, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Michael B. Harwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael B. Harwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management204 days |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sogol Sinaeifar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Kam Kooshki in Support; Filed by: Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kam Kooshki in Support) Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Judgment (Clerk's Judgment for Possession) Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Writ of (Possession) Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) /Entry of Judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Sogol Sinaeifar)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Statement of Decision Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Judgment) Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for orde...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Angelina & Katherine Garden LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Judgment (Clerk's Judgment for Possession)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Sogol Sinaeifar))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kam Kooshki in Support)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for orde...))
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Wafik Bashai in Request for Entry of StipulatedJudgment)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Writ of (Possession)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Wafik Bishia in Support)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/11/2020)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) /Entry of Judg...))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Alfred Tavari in Support)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.