Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Griggs Donna, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Stafford Bernadette Malia, against Doughty Victor R., Gregg Robert E., Hunter Evelyn J., Jones C. Bruce, Niles Allie Laura, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamona G. See Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 22, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause) of 04/08/2020)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 18, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause))
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order continuing Case Management Conference and Order t...))
Date: April 22, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.