Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mitsakos Nicholas Michael, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamona G. See Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 04, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 04, 2020Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Nicholas Michael Mitsakos (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Nicholas Michael Mitsakos (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nicholas Michael Mitsakos (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Nicholas Michael Mitsakos (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Nicholas Michael Mitsakos (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.