Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodriguez Luis, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamona G. See Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 21, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: January 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 21, 2020Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner); Service Costs Waived: No
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Clerk
Date: March 06, 2020Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.