Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Colin Martin, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wu John, against Ela Trinity, Glaspie Verlton Dba Ela Trinity, represented by Yacko Tom Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Gail Killefer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Killefer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions337 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 28, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 28, 2020Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Martin Colin (Plaintiff); As to: ELA Trinity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Verlton Glaspie (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Martin Colin (Plaintiff); As to: ELA Trinity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Verlton Glaspie (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Martin Colin (Plaintiff); As to: ELA Trinity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default or Dismissal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Verlton Glaspie (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Verlton Glaspie (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Martin Colin (Plaintiff); As to: ELA Trinity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Martin Colin (Plaintiff); As to: ELA Trinity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Martin Colin (Plaintiff); As to: ELA Trinity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Verlton Glaspie (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Verlton Glaspie (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.