Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 29, 2021Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Yousef Fotovat (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Yousef Fotovat (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2020Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Yousef Fotovat (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Yousef Fotovat (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.