Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Scott Lightner (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Scott Lightner (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 04, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 06, 2020Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Scott Lightner (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Scott Lightner (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/06/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.