Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time128 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Amanda Toan (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 08, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Amanda Toan (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Amanda Toan (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Amanda Toan (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Amanda Toan (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Amanda Toan (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.