Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Department Of Transportation filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Department Of Transportation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Eureka Norris (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: July 06, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: July 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: October 16, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Eureka Norris (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.