Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Los Angeles filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Jose Roque (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Rescheduling Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 28, 2020Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Roque (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Roque (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: June 19, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Rescheduling 8/26/20 Hearing)
Date: June 26, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: August 28, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: August 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Rescheduling 8/26/20 Hearing) of 06/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Roque (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Jose Roque (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Roque (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.