Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Simmons Hunter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Simmons Juan Jesus, represented by Jalali Lili, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: July 01, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant); As to: Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jesus Olimon (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jesus Olimon (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jesus Olimon (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd); Filed by: Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff); Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Settlement Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: July 07, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by Hunter Simmons (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Seco...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Juan Jesus Simmons (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Order (Order to file second amended complaint and to reclassify matter to unlimited civil [proposed])
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Seco...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.