Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 14, 2020Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Fariba Sedighi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Fariba Sedighi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 Case) of 06/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.