Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Edward B. Moreton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward B. Moreton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Iraj Habibi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Iraj Habibi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Iraj Habibi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: April 07, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/16/20)
Date: April 27, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: April 28, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Iraj Habibi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Iraj Habibi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Iraj Habibi (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.