Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time141 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearings Currently Set For ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: James Low (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: James Low (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 Case) of 06/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.