Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alony Shie filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time138 days |
Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Shie Alony (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Shie Alony (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Shie Alony (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: March 20, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: March 25, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/2/20)
Date: April 21, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)
Date: June 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 11, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: August 05, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/2/20) of 04/21/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Shie Alony (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Shie Alony (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Shie Alony (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.