Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Egbe Andrew M., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Quality Loan Services Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, represented by Dailey Steve, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint
Date: December 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Order (Demurrer to Complaint; Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Plaintiff's Rebuttal to Defendants' Demurrer to Entire Complaint; Filed by: Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Objection to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2021Order Demurrer to Complaint; Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice) Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Plaintiff's Rebuttal to Defendants' Demurrer to Entire Complaint Filed by Andrew M. Egbe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Order (Demurrer to Complaint; Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 02/08/2021)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven M. Dailey)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Motion to Declare Vexatious Litigant
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Plaintiff's Rebuttal to Defendants' Demurrer to Entire Complaint
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Reply (to Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/08/2021)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.