Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martinez Teresa, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Haines Paul Keith, Rodriguez Susan Aurelia, against Doorking Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Doorking Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Message Board Posting; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Defendant Doorking Inc.'s Answer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Doorking Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00SECOND Amended Complaint; Filed by: Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Doorking Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of March 10 hearing to March 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. via e-mail; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service; Signed and Filed by: Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Complex Designation) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of March 10 hearing to March 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. via e-mail) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00First Amended Class And Representative Action Complaint Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Defendant Doorking Inc.'s Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by Doorking Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service on the Labor Workforce Development Agency Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Message Board Posting Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Representation of Defendant Doorking Inc. Filed by Doorking Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00SECOND Amended Complaint Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other f...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Teresa Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 01/08/2021)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement And Request For Continuance
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00First Amended Class And Representative Action Complaint
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of March 10 hearing to March 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. via e-mail)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00SECOND Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Defendant Doorking Inc.'s Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Message Board Posting
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Representation of Defendant Doorking Inc.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.