Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yesco Llc Dba Yesco Signs Llc A Utah Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kornblatt Sara H. Esq., against L.A. Downtown Investment Lp, L.A. Downtown Investment Lp A California Limited Partnership, Lendlease Us Construction Inc., Lendlease Us Construction Inc. A Florida Corporation, Oceanwide Plaza Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is filed by Lendlease (US) Construction, Inc., Oceanwide Plaza, LLC, L.A. Downtown Investment, LP, and DOES 1 through 500. The document does not provide any specific dollar amounts. The complaint alleges violations of statutes, but the...
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (- Civil)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lifting on Stay of Discovery; Further...))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (- Civil)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.