Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Immigrant Rights Defense Council Llc. A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Medvei Sebastian M., against Harding Gladys, represented by Chan Vincent Chee-Kwan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The case number is 20STCV47734 and it has been assigned to the Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Judicial Officer Richard Fruin. The attorney representing the plaintiff is...
Answer
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Related Cases) of 01/26/2021)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-03-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re: Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.