Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bacon Tyshon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Starr Robert Lorne, against Nissan North America Inc. A Corporation, represented by Sweeney Michael P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Bruce G. Iwasaki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce G. Iwasaki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. Peremptory Challenge Aga...) of )
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-Mediation Status Confere...))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal -Settlement [??]))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 23, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. Peremptory Challenge Aga...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (Of Case Reassignment)
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. Peremptory Challenge Aga...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-Mediation Status Confere...))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.