Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hci Systems Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lozano Dustin, Ortmann Dale A., against 8600 Wilshire Boulevard Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Dhc Builders Inc. A California Corporation, Hartford Fire Insurance Company A Connecticut Corporation, represented by Dunn Jonathan, Ellison Michele, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 20, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Stay Action Pending Arbitration; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HCI SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: HCI SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: HCI SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: HCI SYSTEMS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: DHC BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/21/2020)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.