Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Chowaiki Joshua, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yadegari Michael Mordechai, against Rounds Rebekah, represented by Bramlage Gregory John, Rose Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. Crowfoot Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: December 10, 2020Reply REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff); As to: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff); As to: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant); As to: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Opposition to Strike; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lauren Rose (Attorney)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff); As to: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff); As to: JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Not Entered)) Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION) Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Gregory John Bramlage (Attorney)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Bot entered, previously filed) Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Strike) Filed by JOSHUA CHOWAIKI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by REBEKAH ROUNDS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE;)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DA...) of )
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Affidavit (STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATTERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DA...))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order])
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Not Entered))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DATE OF THE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Strike)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE;)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Motion re: (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF;)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE;)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order])
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Strike)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DATE OF THE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE;)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE;)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE;)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DA...))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Motion re: (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF;)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Affidavit (STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATTERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.