Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sandoval Carlos, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nussbaum Lane Michael, Nussbaum Lane, against Rosales Jose Abraham Aka Jose Abraham Rosales Puac, Rosales Celso, Garcia Catalina, represented by Lauria Christopher J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMel Red Recana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Answer
Date: February 16, 2021Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Supplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 16, 2021Demand for Jury Trial (REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Trial Continuance)
Date: January 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/08/2021)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Jose Abraham Rosales))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's Unlawful Detainer Trial Brief)
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession])
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.