Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Immigrant Rights Defense Council Llc. A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Medvei Sebastian M., against Nahui Henry, Nahui Yanet, represented by Chan Vincent, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 04, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: December 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 08, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2020
Date: December 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: January 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)
Date: January 26, 2021Answer
Date: February 18, 2021Stipulation for Judgment
Date: February 19, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2021Minute Order ((Court Order re: Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Yanet Nahui (Defendant); Henry Nahui (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/08/2020)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re: Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Related Cases) of 01/26/2021)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Stipulation for Judgment
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 01/04/2021)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | 20STCV46478 unrelated from 20STCV46556, 20STCV46603, 20STCV47252, 20STCV47260, 20STCV47515, 20STCV47520, 20STCV47727, 20STCV47734, 20STCV48507, 20STCV48518, 20STCV48869, 20STCV48965, BC678747 | |
May 25, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: William F. Highberger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.